UNITED STATES SENATORS FROM CONNECTICUT SINCE 1789
(Abbreviations for political parties denote the following: A, American; D, Democrat; F, Federalist; FS, Free Soil; ID, Independent Democrat; NR, National Republican; O, No record; R, Republican; R*, Jeffersonian Republican; VBD, Van Buren Democrat; W, Whig.)
Name | Town and Party** | Term of Service |
Oliver Ellsworth | Windsor, F | 1789-96 |
William Samuel Johnson | Stratford, O | 1789-91 |
Roger Sherman1 | New Haven, O | 1791-93 |
Stephen Mix Mitchell | Wethersfield, F | 1793-95 |
Jonathan Trumbull | Lebanon, F | 1795-96 |
Uriah Tracy2 | Litchfield, F | 1796-1807 |
James Hillhouse | New Haven, F | 1796-1810 |
Chauncey Goodrich | Hartford, F | 1807-13 |
Samuel W. Dana | Middletown, F | 1810-21 |
David Daggett | New Haven, F | 1813-19 |
James Lanman | Norwich, D | 1819-25 |
Elijah Boardman3 | New Milford, D | 1821-23 |
Henry W. Edwards | New Haven, D | 1823-27 |
Calvin Willey | Tolland, D | 1825-31 |
Samuel A. Foot | Cheshire, W | 1827-33 |
Gideon Tomlinson | Fairfield, R | 1831-37 |
Nathan Smith4 | New Haven, W | 1833-35 |
John M. Niles | Hartford, D | 1835-39, 43-49 |
Perry Smith | New Milford, D | 1837-43 |
Thaddeus Betts5 | Norwalk, W | 1839-40 |
Jabez W. Huntington | Norwich, W | 1840-47 |
Roger S. Baldwin | New Haven, W | 1847-51 |
Truman Smith | Litchfield, W | 1849-54 |
Isaac Toucey | Hartford, D | 1852-57 |
Francis Gillett | Hartford, W | 1854-55 |
LaFayette S. Foster | Norwich, R | 1855-67 |
James Dixon | Hartford, R | 1857-69 |
Orris S. Ferry6 | Norwalk, R | 1867-75 |
William A. Buckingham7 | Norwich, R | 1869-75 |
James E. English | New Haven, D | 1875-76 |
William W. Eaton | Hartford, D | 1875-81 |
William H. Barnum | Salisbury, D | 1876-79 |
Orville H. Platt8 | Meriden, R | 1879-1905 |
Joseph R. Hawley | Hartford, R | 1881-1905 |
Morgan G. Bulkeley | Hartford, R | 1905-11 |
Frank B. Brandegee9 | New London, R | 1905-24 |
George P. McLean | Simsbury, R | 1911-29 |
Hiram Bingham10 | New Haven, R | 1924-33 |
Frederic C. Walcott | Norfolk, R | 1929-35 |
Augustine Lonergan | Hartford, D | 1933-39 |
Francis T. Maloney11 | Meriden, D | 1935-45 |
John A. Danaher | Portland, R | 1939-45 |
Brien McMahon12 | Norwalk, D | 1945-52 |
Thomas C. Hart13 | Sharon, R | 1945-46 |
Raymond E. Baldwin14 | Stratford, R | 1946-49 |
William Benton15 | Fairfield, D | 1949-53 |
William A. Purtell16 | West Hartford, R | 1952-59 |
Prescott Bush17 | Greenwich, R | 1952-63 |
Thomas J. Dodd | West Hartford, D | 1959-71 |
Abraham A. Ribicoff | Hartford, D | 1963-81 |
Lowell P. Weicker, Jr. | Greenwich, R | 1971-88 |
Christopher J. Dodd | East Haddam, D | 1981-2011 |
Joseph I. Lieberman18 | New Haven, ID | 1989-2013 |
Richard Blumenthal | Greenwich, D | 2011- |
Christopher S. Murphy | Cheshire, D | 2013- |
**Town listed is town of residence at time of election.
1 Died in Office, July 23, 1793.
2 Died in Office, July 19, 1807.
3 Died in Office, October 8, 1823.
4 Died in Office, December 6, 1835.
5 Died in Office, April 7, 1840.
6 Died in Office, November 21, 1875.
7 Died in Office, February 5, 1875.
8 Died in Office, April 21, 1905.
9 Died in Office, October 14, 1924.
10 State election was held November 6, 1924. Hiram Bingham was elected Governor. On December 16th, he was elected U.S. Senator at a special election; he accepted the office after being inaugurated Governor, and resigned the Governorship.
11 Died in Office, January 16, 1945, and was succeeded in office by Thomas C. Hart.
12 Died in Office, July 28, 1952.
13 Appointed February 8, 1945, to fill the vacancy caused by the death of Francis T. Maloney. Resigned November 5, 1946.
14 Elected November 5, 1946, to fill the vacancy caused by the resignation of Thomas C. Hart and for the full term beginning January 3, 1947. Resigned to accept appointment as an Associate Justice of the Connecticut Supreme Court of Errors December 17, 1949.
15 Appointed December 17, 1949 and elected November 7, 1950, to fill vacancy caused by the resignation of Raymond E. Baldwin.
16 Appointed August 29, 1952, to fill the vacancy caused by the death of Brien McMahon, served until November 4, 1952. Elected for full term beginning January 3, 1953.
17 Elected November 4, 1952, to fill the unexpired term of Brien McMahon.
18 In 2007, Senator Lieberman changed his party affiliation from Democrat (D) to Independent Democrat (ID).
REPRESENTATIVES IN CONGRESS FROM CONNECTICUT SINCE 1789
Prior to 1837 the Representatives from this state were elected by the people at large. The number at first, under the Constitution, was five and by later apportionments was changed in 1793 to seven, in 1823 to six, and in 1843 to four. From 1837 to 1843 they were elected one from each of the six districts into which the state was divided by an act of the General Assembly; from 1843 to 1911 they were elected, one from each of the four districts established by the General Assembly of 1842, as follows: District number one, consisting of the counties of Hartford and Tolland; district number two, the counties of New Haven and Middlesex; district number three, the counties of New London and Windham; district number four, the counties of Fairfield and Litchfield. A fifth representative, to which the state was entitled under the census of 1900, was chosen at large. At the session of 1911 the state was divided into five districts as follows: District No. 1, County of Hartford; District No. 2, Counties of Tolland, Windham, New London and Middlesex; District No. 3, Towns of Bethany, Branford, Cheshire, East Haven, Guilford, Hamden, Madison, Meriden, Milford, New Haven, North Branford, North Haven, Orange, Wallingford, West Haven and Woodbridge in County of New Haven; District No. 4, County of Fairfield; District No. 5, County of Litchfield and the Towns of Ansonia, Beacon Falls, Derby, Middlebury, Naugatuck, Oxford, Prospect, Seymour, Southbury, Waterbury and Wolcott in the County of New Haven. The 1921 session of the General Assembly enacted a law creating the office of Congressman-at-Large if a reapportionment stemming from the 1920 census gave Connecticut a sixth congressional seat. However, Congress did not reapportion until after the 1930 census and, at this time, the state received the sixth post of Congressman-at-Large. A 1931 act of the General Assembly stated this representative was to be "designated as 'Representative-at-Large.'" The State was divided into six districts by act of the General Assembly in Special Session, April 1964, abolishing the post of Representative-at-Large. As a result of the 2000 census, the number of congressional districts in Connecticut was reduced from six to five. The composition of the five districts was established by the Plan of Districting approved by the Reapportionment Commission pursuant to the Connecticut Constitution and filed in the Office of the Secretary of the State on December 21, 2001. As a result of the 2010 census, the number of congressional districts in Connecticut remained at five. The composition of the five districts was established by the Plan of Districting adopted by the Connecticut Supreme Court and filed in the Office of the Secretary of the State on February 10, 2012.
In instances where no districts are given, the elections were at large.
Name | Town and Party** | District | Congress | Term of Service |
Allen, John | Litchfield, F | 5 | 1797-99 | |
Arnold, Samuel | Haddam, D | 2 | 35 | 1857-59 |
Austin, Albert E. | Old Greenwich, R | 4 | 76 | 1939-41 |
Bakewell, Charles M. | New Haven, R | 73 | 1933-35 | |
Baldwin, John | Windham, W | 19,20 | 1825-29 | |
Baldwin, Simeon | New Haven, F | 8 | 1803-05 | |
Ball, Thomas R. | Old Lyme, R | 2 | 76 | 1939-41 |
Barber, Noyes | Groton, D | 17-23 | 1821-35 | |
Barnum, William H. | Salisbury, D | 4 | 40-44 | 1867-77 |
Belcher, Nathan | New London, D | 3 | 33 | 1853-55 |
Bishop, Wm. D. | Bridgeport, D | 4 | 35 | 1857-59 |
Boardman, Wm. W. | New Haven, W | 2 | 27 | 1841-43 |
Booth, Walter | Meriden, FS | 2 | 31 | 1849-51 |
Bowles, Chester | Essex, D | 2 | 86 | 1959-61 |
Brace, Jonathan | Hartford, F | 5,6 | 1798-1801 | |
Brandegee, Augustus | New London, R | 3 | 38,39 | 1863-67 |
Brandegee, Frank B.1 | New London, R | 3 | 57-59 | 1902-05 |
Brockway, John H. | Ellington, W | 6 | 26,27 | 1839-43 |
Buck, John R. | Hartford, R | 1 | 47-49 | [1881-83] [1885-87] |
Burnham, Alfred A. |
Windham, R |
3 |
36,37 |
1859-63 |
Burrows, Daniel |
Groton, D |
17 |
1821-23 |
|
Butler, Thomas B. | Norwalk, W | 4 | 31 | 1849-51 |
Catlin, George S. | Windham, D | 3 | 28 | 1843-45 |
Chapman, Charles | Hartford, W | 1 | 32 | 1851-53 |
Champion, Epaphroditus | East Haddam, F | 10-14 | 1807-17 | |
Citron, William M. | Middletown, D | 74,75 | 1935-39 | |
Clark, Ezra, Jr. | Hartford, R | 1 | 34,35 | 1855-59 |
Cleveland, Chauncey F. | Hampton, D | 3 | 31,32 | 1849-53 |
Coit, Joshua | New London, F | 3-5 | 1793-98 | |
Compton, Ranulf | Madison, R | 3 | 78 | 1943-45 |
Cotter, William R.2 | Hartford, D | 1 | 92-97 | 1971-81 |
Courtney, Joe | Vernon, D | 2 | 110- | 2007- |
Cretella, Albert W. | North Haven, R | 3 | 83-85 | 1953-59 |
Daddario, Emilio Q. | Hartford, D | 1 | 86-91 | 1959-71 |
Dana, Samuel W. | Middletown, F | 4-11 | 1796-1810 | |
Davenport, James | Stamford, O | 4,5 | 1796-97 | |
Davenport, John | Stamford, F | 6-14 | 1799-1817 | |
Dean, Sidney | Thompson, R | 3 | 34,35 | 1855-59 |
DeForest, Robert E. | Bridgeport, D | 4 | 52,53 | 1891-95 |
DeLauro, Rosa | New Haven, D | 3 | 102- | 1991- |
Deming, Henry C. | Hartford, R | 1 | 38,39 | 1863-67 |
DeNardis, Lawrence J. | Hamden, R | 3 | 97 | 1981-83 |
Dixon, James | Hartford, W | 1 | 29,30 | 1845-49 |
Dodd, Christopher J. | Norwich, D | 2 | 94-96 | 1975-81 |
Dodd, Thomas J. | West Hartford, D | 1 | 83,84 | 1953-57 |
Donovan, Jeremiah | Norwalk, D | 4 | 63 | 1913-15 |
Downs, LeRoy D. | So. Norwalk, D | 4 | 77 | 1941-43 |
Dwight, Theodore | Hartford, F | 9 | 1806-07 | |
Eaton, William W. | Hartford, D | 1 | 48 | 1883-85 |
Edmond, William | Newtown, F | 5,6 | 1797-1801 | |
Edwards, Henry W. | New Haven, D | 16,17 | 1819-23 | |
Ellsworth, Wm. W.3 | Hartford, W | 21-23 | 1829-33 | |
English, James E. | New Haven, D | 2 | 37,38 | 1861-65 |
Esty, Elizabeth | Cheshire, D | 5 | 113-116 | 2013-2019 |
Fenn, E. Hart | Wethersfield, R | 1 | 67-71 | 1921-31 |
Ferry, Orris S. | Norwalk, R | 4 | 36 | 1859-61 |
Fitzgerald, William J. | Norwich, D | 2 | 75-77 | [1937-39] [1941-43] |
Foot, Samuel A. | Cheshire, W | 16,18,23 | [1819-21] [1823-25] [1833-35] |
|
Foote, Ellsworth B. | No. Branford, R | 3 | 80 | 1947-49 |
Franks, Gary A. | Waterbury, R | 5 | 102-104 | 1991-97 |
Freeman, Richard P. | New London, R | 2 | 64-72 | 1915-33 |
French, Carlos | Seymour, D | 2 | 50 | 1887-89 |
Geelan, James P. | New Haven, D | 3 | 79 | 1945-47 |
Gejdenson, Sam | Bozrah, D | 2 | 97-106 | 1981-2001 |
Giaimo, Robert N. | North Haven, D | 3 | 86-96 | 1959-81 |
Gilbert, Sylvester | Hebron, O | 15 | 1818-19 | |
Glynn, James P. | Winsted, R | 5 | 64-67 69-71 |
[1915-23] [1925-31] |
Goddard, Calvin | Plainfield, F | 7,8 | 1801-05 | |
Goodrich, Chauncey | Hartford, F | 4-6 | 1795-1801 | |
Goodrich, Elizur | New Haven, F | 6 | 1799-1801 | |
Goss, Edward W. | Waterbury, R | 5 | 71-73 | 1930-35 |
Grabowski, Bernard F. | Bristol, D | 6 | 88,89 | [1963-65] [1965-67] |
Granger, Miles T. | North Canaan, D | 4 | 50 | 1887-89 |
Grasso, Ella T. | Windsor Locks, D | 6 | 92-93 | 1971-75 |
Griswold, Roger | Lyme, F | 4-8 | 1795-1805 | |
Haley, Elisha | Groton, D | 3 | 24,25 | 1835-39 |
Hawley, Joseph R. | Hartford, R | 1 | 43,46 | [1873-75] [1879-81] |
Hayes, Jahana | Wolcott, D | 5 | 116- | 2019- |
Henry, E. Stevens | Vernon, R | 1 | 54-62 | 1895-1913 |
Higgins, Edwin W.4 | Norwich, R | 3 | 59-62 | 1905-13 |
Higgins, William L. | So. Coventry, R | 2 | 73,74 | 1933-37 |
Hill, Ebenezer J.5 | Norwalk, R | 4 | 54-62, 64,65 |
[1895-1913] [1915-17] |
Hillhouse, James | New Haven, F | 2-5 | 1791-96 | |
Himes, Jim | Greenwich, D | 4 | 111- | 2009- |
Holmes, Uriel | Litchfield, F | 15 | 1817-18 | |
Holt, Orrin | Willington, D | 6 | 25 | 1837-39 |
Hotchkiss, Julius | Middletown, R | 2 | 40 | 1867-69 |
Hubbard, John H. | Litchfield, R | 4 | 38,39 | 1863-67 |
Hubbard, Richard D. | Hartford, D | 1 | 40 | 1867-69 |
Hubbard, Samuel D. | Middletown, W | 2 | 29, 30 | 1845-49 |
Huntington, Benjamin | Norwich, O | 1 | 1789-91 | |
Huntington, Ebenezer | Norwich, W | 11,15 | [1810-11] [1817-19] |
|
Huntington, Jabez W. | Litchfield, W | 21-23 | 1829-35 | |
Ingersoll, Colin M. | New Haven, D | 2 | 32,33 | 1851-55 |
Ingersoll, Ralph I. | New Haven, D | 19-22 | 1825-33 | |
Ingham, Samuel | Saybrook, D | 2 | 24,25 | 1835-39 |
Irwin, Donald J. | Norwalk, D | 4 | 86, 89-90 |
[1959-61] [1965-69] |
Jackson, Ebenezer, Jr.4 | Middletown, W | 24 | 1834-35 | |
Johnson, Nancy L. Johnson, Nancy L.15 |
New Britain, R New Britain, R |
6 5 |
98-107 108-109 |
1983-2003 2003-2007 |
Judson, Andrew T. | Canterbury, D | 24 | 1835-37 | |
Kellogg, Stephen W. | Waterbury, R | 2 | 41-43 | 1869-75 |
Kennedy, William | Naugatuck, D | 5 | 63 | 1913-15 |
Kennelly, Barbara B.6 | Hartford, D | 1 | 97-105 | 1982-99 |
Kopplemann, Herman P. | Hartford, D | 1 | 73-75, 77,79 | [1933-39] [1941-43] [1945-47] |
Kowalski, Frank, Jr. | Meriden, D | 86,87 | 1959-63 | |
Landers, George M. | New Britain, D | 1 | 44,45 | 1875-79 |
Larson, John B. | East Hartford, D | 1 | 106- | 1999- |
Law, Lyman | New London, F | 12-14 | 1811-17 | |
Learned, Amasa | New London, O | 2,3 | 1791-95 | |
Lilley, George L. | Waterbury, R | 58-60 | 1903-09 | |
Lodge, John Davis | Westport, R | 4 | 80,81 | 1947-51 |
Lonergan, Augustine | Hartford, D | 1 | 63, 65,66, 72 |
[1913-15] [1917-21] [1931-33] |
Loomis, Dwight | Hartford, R | 1 | 36,37 | 1859-63 |
Luce, Clare Boothe | Greenwich, R | 4 | 78,79 | 1943-47 |
Maciora, Lucien J. | New Britain, D | 77 | 1941-43 | |
Mahan, Bryan F. | New London, D | 2 | 63 | 1913-15 |
Maloney, Francis T. | Meriden, D | 3 | 73 | 1933-35 |
Maloney, James H. | Danbury, D | 5 | 105-107 | 1997-2003 |
May, Edwin H., Jr. | Wethersfield, R | 1 | 85 | 1957-59 |
McGuire, John A. | Wallingford, D | 3 | 81,82 | 1949-53 |
McKinney, Stewart B.7 | Fairfield, R | 4 | 92-100 | 1971-87 |
McWilliams, John D. | Norwich, R | 2 | 78 | 1943-45 |
Merritt, Schuyler8 | Stamford, R | 4 | 65-71, 73,74 |
[1917-31] [1933-37] |
Merwin, Orange | New Milford, O | 19,20 | 1825-29 | |
Meskill, Thomas J. | New Britain, R | 6 | 90,91 | 1967-71 |
Miles, Frederick | Salisbury, R | 4 | 46,47, 51 |
[1879-83] [1889-91] |
Miller, William J. | Wethersfield, R | 1 | 76,78,80 | [1939-41] [1943-45] [1947-49] |
Miner, Phineas8 | Litchfield, W | 24 | 1834-35 | |
Mitchell, Charles L. | New Haven, D | 2 | 48,49 | 1883-87 |
Moffett, Anthony Toby | Farmington, D | 6 | 94-97 | 1975-83 |
Monagan, John S. | Waterbury, D | 5 | 86-92 | 1959-73 |
Monkiewicz, Boleslaus J. | New Britain, R | 76,78 | [1939-41] [1943-45] |
|
Morano, Albert P. | Greenwich, R | 4 | 82-85 | 1951-59 |
Morrison, Bruce A. | Hamden, D | 3 | 98-101 | 1983-91 |
Moseley, Jonathan O. | East Haddam, F | 9-16 | 1805-21 | |
Murphy, Christopher S. | Cheshire, D | 5 | 110-112 | 2007-2013 |
Oakey, P. Davis | Hartford, R | 1 | 64 | 1915-17 |
Osborne, Thomas B. | Fairfield, W | 4 | 26,27 | 1839-43 |
O'Sullivan, Patrick B. | Derby, D | 5 | 68 | 1923-25 |
Patterson, James T. | Watertown, R | 5 | 80-85 | 1947-59 |
Perkins, Elias | New London, F | 7 | 1801-03 | |
Phelps, Elisha | Simsbury, D | 16, 19,20 |
[1819-21] [1825-29] |
|
Phelps, James | Essex, D | 2 | 44-47 | 1875-83 |
Phelps, Lancelot | Colebrook, D | 5 | 24,25 | 1835-39 |
Phillips, Alfred N., Jr. | Stamford, D | 4 | 75 | 1937-39 |
Pigott, James P. | New Haven, D | 2 | 53 | 1893-95 |
Pitkin, Timothy | Farmington, F | 9-15 | 1805-19 | |
Plant, David | Stratford, NR | 20 | 1827-29 | |
Pratt, James T. | Rocky Hill, D | 1 | 33 | 1853-55 |
Ratchford, William R. | Danbury, D | 5 | 96-98 | 1979-85 |
Reilly, Thomas L. | Meriden, D | 3* | 62,63 | 1911-15 |
Ribicoff, Abraham A. | Hartford, D | 1 | 81,82 | 1949-53 |
Rockwell, John A. | Norwich, W | 3 | 29,30 | 1845-49 |
Rowland, John G. | Waterbury, R | 5 | 99-101 | 1985-91 |
Russ, John | Hartford, D | 16,17 | 1819-23 | |
Russell, Chas. A.9 | Killingly, R | 3 | 50-57 | 1887-1902 |
Ryter, Joseph F. | Hartford, D | 79 | 1945-47 | |
Sadlak, Antoni N. | Rockville, R | 80-85 | 1947-59 | |
Sarasin, Ronald A. | Beacon Falls, R | 5 | 93-95 | 1973-79 |
St. Onge, William L.10 | Putnam, D | 2 | 88-91 | 1963-70 |
Seely-Brown, Horace, Jr. | Pomfret, R | 2 | 80, 82-85, 87 |
[1947-49] [1951-59] [1961-63] |
Seymour, Edward W. | Bridgeport, D | 4 | 48,49 | 1883-87 |
Seymour, Origen S. | Litchfield, D | 4 | 32,33 | 1851-55 |
Seymour, Thomas H. | Hartford, D | 1 | 28 | 1843-45 |
Shanley, James A. | New Haven, D | 3 | 74-77 | 1935-43 |
Shays, Christopher11 | Bridgeport, R | 4 | 100-110 | 1987-2008 |
Sherman, Roger | New Haven, O | 1 | 1789-91 | |
Sherwood, Sam'l B. | Fairfield, F | 15 | 1817-19 | |
Sibal, Abner W. | Norwalk, R | 4 | 87,88 | 1961-65 |
Simmons, Robert R. | Stonington, R | 2 | 107-109 | 2001-2007 |
Simonds, Wm. E. | Canton, R | 1 | 51 | 1889-91 |
Simons, Samuel | Bridgeport, D | 4 | 28 | 1843-45 |
Smith, John Cotton | Sharon, F | 6-9 | 1800-06 | |
Smith, J. Joseph | Waterbury, D | 5 | 74-77 | 1935-43 |
Smith, Nathaniel | Woodbury, F | 4,5 | 1795-99 | |
Smith, Truman | Litchfield, W | 5 4 |
26,27, 29,30 |
[1839-43] [1845-49] |
Sperry, Lewis | So. Windsor, D | 1 | 52,53 | 1891-95 |
Sperry, Nehemiah D. | New Haven, R | 2 | 54-61 | 1895-1911 |
Starkweather, Henry H. | New London, R | 3 | 40-44 | 1867-77 |
Steele, Robert H.12 | Vernon, R | 2 | 91-93 | 1970-75 |
Sterling, Ansel | Sharon, O | 17,18 | 1821-25 | |
Stevens, James | Stamford, D | 16 | 1819-21 | |
Stewart, John | Chatham, D | 2 | 28 | 1843-45 |
Stoddard, Ebenezer | Woodstock, O | 17,18 | 1821-25 | |
Storrs, William L. | Middletown, W | 2 |
21,22, 26 |
[1829-33] [1839-41] |
Strong, Julius L. | Hartford, R | 1 | 41,42 | 1869-73 |
Sturges, Jonathan | Fairfield, F | 1,2 | 1789-93 | |
Sturgis, Lewis B. | Fairfield, F | 9-14 | 1805-17 | |
Swift, Zephaniah | Windham, F | 3,4 | 1793-97 | |
Talbot, Joseph E. | Naugatuck, R | 5 | 77-79 | 1942-47 |
Talmadge, Benjamin | Litchfield, F | 7-14 | 1801-17 | |
Terry, Nathaniel | Hartford, O | 15 | 1817-19 | |
Tierney, William L. | Greenwich, D | 4 | 72 | 1931-33 |
Tilson, John Q. | New Haven, R | 3 | 61,62, 64-72 |
[1909-13] [1915-33] |
Tomlinson, Gideon | Fairfield, R | 16-19 | 1819-27 | |
Toucey, Isaac | Hartford, D | 1 | 24,25 | 1835-39 |
Tracy, Uriah | Litchfield, F | 3,4 | 1793-96 | |
Trumbull, Jonathan | Lebanon, F | 1-3 | 1789-95 | |
Trumbull, Joseph13 | Hartford, W | 1 | 24-27 | 1834-43 |
Tweedy, Samuel | Danbury, W | 23 | 1833-35 | |
Vance, Robert J. | New Britain, D | 1 | 50 | 1887-89 |
Wadsworth, Jeremiah | Hartford, F | 1-3 | 1789-95 | |
Wait, John T. | Norwich, R | 3 | 45-49 | 1877-87 |
Waldo, Loren P. | Tolland, D | 1 | 31 | 1849-51 |
Warner, Levi | Norwalk, D | 4 | 45 | 1877-79 |
Warner, Samuel L. | Middletown, R | 2 | 39 | 1865-67 |
Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. | Greenwich, R | 4 | 91,92 | 1969-71 |
Welch, William W. | Norfolk, A | 4 | 34 | 1855-57 |
Whitman, Lemuel | Farmington, D | 18 | 1823-25 | |
Whittlesey, Thos. T. | Danbury, VBD | 4 | 25 | 1837-39 |
Wildman, Zalmon14 | Danbury, D | 24 | 1835 | |
Wilcox, Washington F. | Saybrook, D | 2 | 51,52 | 1889-93 |
Williams, Thomas S. | Hartford, O | 15 | 1817-19 | |
Williams, Thomas W. | New London, W | 3 | 26,27 | 1839-43 |
Woodhouse, Chase Going | New London, D | 2 | 79,81 | [1945-47] [1949-51] |
Woodruff, George C. | Litchfield, D | 4 | 37 | 1861-63 |
Woodruff, John | New Haven, A | 2 | 34,36 | [1855-57] [1859-61] |
Young, Ebenezer | Killingly, F | 21-23 | 1829-35 |
**Town listed is town of residence at time of election.
1 Elected to fill vacancy to March 4, 1903, and for the 58th and 59th sessions of Congress. Resigned in 1905 to become U.S. Senator, to fill vacancy caused by death of Senator Orville H. Platt.
2 Died during term, September 8, 1981.
2 Died during term, September 8, 1981.
3 Resigned 1833.
4 Elected to fill vacancy.
5 Died during term.
6 Elected January 12, 1982, to fill the vacancy created by the death of William R. Cotter. Took oath of office on January 25, 1982.
7 Died during term, May 7, 1987.
8 Elected to fill vacancy.
*District changed from Second to Third.
9 Died during term.
10 Died during term, May 1, 1970.
11 Elected August 18, 1987, to fill vacancy caused by the death of Stewart B. McKinney. Took office on Sept. 9, 1987.
12 Elected November 3, 1970, to fill the vacancy caused by death of William L. St. Onge and for the full term beginning January 3, 1971.
13 Elected for unexpired portion of term in 1834.
14 Died at Washington, December 10, 1835.
15 Following the 2001 redistricting, the number of Congressional Districts was reduced from six to five and Nancy Johnson was elected to the reconfigured fifth district.